Buff file cover with green text. 'Unit: 617 Squadron, title: [...] of official file, W/C Cheshire DSO, DFC. Reference: GLC\DO\43, 15'. Reported as file containing correspondence to and from Leonard Cheshire Nov 1943 - Mar 1947
Roy White’s RAF Flying Log Book from 15th March 1944 to 16th April 1947, detailing his training and duties as a wireless operator.
He was stationed at RAF Yatesbury (No.2 Radio School), RAF Aqir (No. 76 Operational Training Unit and No. 26…
Service and Release Book, issued to Roy White. It includes his first medical and a short physical description of him. He served from 30 August 1943 to 16 June 1947.
The story of Roy Chadwick, Chief Designer of A.V. Roe & Co Ltd from 1919 to 1947, The aircraft he designed, and the lasting contribution he made to Britain's aviation industry. Covers chapter 1 - 15. Starts with early years and then a has a chapter…
Continues from Volume 1. Starts with chapter 16 which covers the design and production of the York. Chapter 17, the war effort and rewards. Continues with part V - into the jet era. Chapter 19 covers civil airliners and the Shackleton. Chapter 20:…
#1 is an airman standing on a hillside, captioned 'At Roseneath on last leave Feb 1947'.
#2 is a car, captioned 'The original "Old Mother Riley" Mk1'.
#3 is a starboard side view of a Mosquito, captioned 'Rollo Kingsford-Smith's Mosquito AZ-R 627,…
Pilots flying log book for Ronald Mathers covering the period from 1 October 1944 to 24 February 1948. Detailing his flying training, instructor duties and duties with 35 squadron. He was stationed at RAF Swinderby, RAF Finningley, RAF Hullavington,…
Observer’s and air gunner’s flying log book for R B Carpenter, bomb aimer, covering the period from 16 May 1941 to 30 April 1945 and from 13 November 1950 to 27 May 1953. Detailing his flying training, operations flown, instructor duties and post…
Gives details of Ronald's service. Was initially trained as a Wireless operator but remustered to Air Bomber in June 1942. He did his first tour on No 10 Squadron flying in the Halifax from RAF Melbourne and was awarded the DFM. He was commissioned…
The Air Forces India F373 has his service details and next of kin. The Form 256 is the Medical Report Prior to Release, records that he has served in the U.K. for 4yrs 7 months, India 1 yr, Indo China 6 months and Burma 6 months. It was carried out…
Observer’s and air gunner’s flying log book for R H Riding, navigator, covering the period from 5 January 1942 to 25 April 1948. Detailing his flying training, operations flown, instructor duties and post war flying with 1332 Heavy Conversion…
Flying log book for navigators air bomber air gunners flight engineers for R G Doble, air gunner, covering the period from 10 September 1945 to 1 July 1947. Detailing his flying training, instructor duties and post war squadron duties with 97…
Navigators, air bombers, air gunners and flight engineers flying log book for Richard Vipond, covering the period from 29 May 1944 to 18 November 1953. Detailing his flying training, operations flown, instructor duties and post war duties with 514,…
Six photographs from an album.
Photo 1 is a family on a promenade, captioned 'Dec 1942 Hearty Greetings for Christmas and the New Year'.
Photo 2 is Rex Searle captioned '1942-3'.
Photo 3 is Rex Searle dated 1947.
Photo 4 is a girl captioned…
Flying log book for aircrew other than pilot for R C Weeden, navigator, covering the period from 27 May 1943 to 31 January 1948. Detailing his flying training, operations flown and post war flying with 35 squadron. He was stationed at RCAF Malton,…
The Observer’s and Air Gunner’s Log Book covering the period 15 June 1941 to the 16 August 1963. Manning qualified first as an Air Gunner on the 4 July 1941 and second as a flight engineer on the 1 September 1941. He was commissioned on the 4…