Aircrew flying log book 4, for F S W Jolliffe, navigator/radar, covering the period from 4 December 1956 to 20 July 1961. Detailing his flying duties with 46, 141, 41, 60 squadrons and headquarters number 11 group. He was stationed at RAF Odiham, RAF…
L Pickford’s Observer’s Flying Log Book covering the period from 17 October 1938 to 17 May 1947, detailing his flying training and operations flown as Wireless Operator/ Air Gunner. He was stationed at RAF Bassingbourn (104 Squadron), RAF West…