W. Freeman’s RAF Navigator’s, Air Bomber’s and Air Gunner’s Flying Log Book, from 1st August 1943 to 29th November 1944, detailing training, operations and instructional duties as an air gunner. He was stationed at RAF Stormy Down (No. 7 Air…
Pilots flying log book for T Wier, covering the period from 12 May 1941 to 5 October 1955. Detailing his flying training, Instructor duties, operations flown and post war flying with Number 4 Ferry Pool and Number 48, 9, 27 Maintenance Units. He was…