P R Taylor’s Observer’s and Air Gunner’s Flying Log Book, from 26 April 1943 to 25 October 1945, detailing training and operations as a Navigator (occasionally Bomb Aimer) in the Mediterranean area. Based at: Oudtshoorn (No. 45 Air School),…
Aircrew flying log book for H K W Algar, navigator, covering the period from 2 September 1964 to 13 July 1966. Detailing his flying duties with 38 Squadron, and instructor duties with Maritime Operational Training Unit. He was stationed at RAF Luqa…
Aircrew flying log book for H K M Algar, navigator, covering the period from 11 August 1959 to 25 August 1964. Detailing his flying duties with 204 Squadron and 38 Squadron. He was stationed at RAF Ballykelly, RAF Kinloss and RAF Luqa. Aircraft flown…
Detailing his flying training and operations flown as navigator 16 January 1941 to 9 January 1946. He was stationed at RCAF Winnipeg (6 AOS), RCAF MacDonald (3 B&GS), RCAF Rivers (1 ANS), RAF Harwell (15 OTU), RAF Shallufa (38 and 40 Squadrons), …